Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luiz Felipe de Nadal

Deceased

Bishop of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1916BornMussum de Aratinho
22 Oct 193923.4Ordained PriestPriest of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
9 May 195539.0AppointedBishop of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
29 Jun 195539.1Ordained BishopBishop of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
1 Jul 196347.1DiedBishop of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luiz Felipe de Nadal:
Bishop Luiz Felipe de Nadal (born , died ) Bishop of Uruguaiana

  • a priest for 23.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015