Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adilson Pedro Busin, C.S.

Auxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul

Titular Bishop of Guardialfiera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1965 BornSarandi
31 May 199227.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Missionaries of Saint Charles Borromeo
9 Jan 199327.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Missionaries of Saint Charles Borromeo
27 Jan 201650.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
27 Jan 201650.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Guardialfiera
30 Apr 201650.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Guardialfiera

MicroData Summary for Adilson Pedro Busin
Bishop Adilson Pedro Busin C.S. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Porto Alegre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jan 2016
  • ob: CB, 4 Feb 2016
  • c2+: CB, 6 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 30 Apr 2016