Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cândido Julio Bampi, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul

Titular Bishop of Tlos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1889BornCaxias do Sul
10 Aug 191425.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
27 Jun 193647.4AppointedPrelate of Vacaria, Brazil
27 Jun 193647.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tlos
4 Oct 193647.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tlos
18 Jan 195768.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caxias, Brazil
7 Jul 197889.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Cândido Julio Bampi:
Bishop Cândido Julio Bampi O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Caxias do Sul

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013