Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Octaviano Pereira de Albuquerque

Deceased

Bishop of Campos, Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1866BornCanguçu
8 Dec 188822.4Ordained PriestPriest
2 Apr 191447.7AppointedBishop of Piaui, Brazil
11 Jun 191447.9Ordained BishopBishop of Piaui, Brazil
24 Sep 191448.2InstalledBishop of Piaui, Brazil
27 Oct 192256.3AppointedArchbishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Maranho, Brazil
16 Dec 193569.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Campos, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
3 Jan 194982.5DiedBishop of Campos, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Octaviano Pereira de Albuquerque:
Archbishop Octaviano Pereira de Albuquerque (born , died ) Bishop of Campos

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013