Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Biagio de Dura

Deceased

Bishop of Potenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1677BornCitta di Penna
30 Aug 171336.6AppointedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
3 Sep 171336.6Ordained BishopBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
2 Mar 172245.1AppointedBishop of Potenza, Italy
Apr 174063.2DiedBishop of Potenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Biagio de Dura:
Bishop Biagio de Dura (born ) Bishop of Potenza

  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1722
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013