Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Agostino Superbo

Archbishop of Potenza-Muro Lucano-Marsico Nuovo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1940 BornMinervino Murge
29 Jun 196323.3Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 199151.2AppointedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
29 Jun 199151.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
19 Nov 199454.7AppointedBishop of Altamura-Gravina-Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
6 Aug 199757.4ResignedBishop of Altamura-Gravina-Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
9 Jan 200160.9AppointedArchbishop of Potenza-Muro Lucano-Marsico Nuovo, Italy
25 Mar 200161.1InstalledArchbishop of Potenza-Muro Lucano-Marsico Nuovo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Agostino Superbo:
Archbishop Agostino Superbo (born ) Archbishop of Potenza-Muro Lucano-Marsico Nuovo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Potenza-Muro Lucano-Marsico Nuovo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,457
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015