Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccol˛ Vivari

Deceased

Bishop of Chieti


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Nov 1392AppointedBishop of Potenza, Italy
21 May 1395AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
1410²AppointedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
1 Feb 1419AppointedBishop of Chieti, Italy
6 Nov 1428DiedBishop of Chieti, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccol˛ Vivari:
Bishop Niccol˛ Vivari (died ) Bishop of Chieti

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 31 Jan 2014
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 461, and Page 481
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 407, and Page 247

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 1 Feb 2014