Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspare Cardoso, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Potenza


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Apr 1603AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Potenza, Italy
7 Apr 1603AppointedTitular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)
13 Apr 1603Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)
19 Jun 1606SucceededBishop of Potenza, Italy
1615²DiedBishop of Potenza, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspare Cardoso:
Bishop Gaspare Cardoso O.S.B. Bishop of Potenza

  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 287, and Page 176
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 39, Number 205

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013