Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baldassare de Benavente, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Potenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1638³BornSalamanca, Spain
12 Dec 168547.8SelectedBishop of Potenza, Italy
13 May 168648.2ConfirmedBishop of Potenza, Italy
19 May 168648.2Ordained BishopBishop of Potenza, Italy
30 Oct 168749.7DiedBishop of Potenza, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Baldassare de Benavente:
Bishop Baldassare de Benavente O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of Potenza

  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 323
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 227, Number 1,413

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013