Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agnello Rossi, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Potenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1647³Born
18 May 167023.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
27 May 167023.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
2 May 169548.0AppointedBishop of Potenza, Italy
8 May 169548.1Ordained BishopBishop of Potenza, Italy
30 Apr 170760.0DiedBishop of Potenza, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agnello Rossi
Bishop Agnello Rossi O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Potenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 323
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast