Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Cesare

Deceased

Bishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1752BornNapoli
10 Jun 177523.2Ordained PriestPriest
Jun 1805³53.2SelectedBishop of Potenza, Italy
26 Jun 180553.3ConfirmedBishop of Potenza, Italy
30 Jun 180553.3Ordained BishopBishop of Potenza, Italy
30 Sep 181967.5DiedBishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Cesare:
Bishop Bartolomeo Cesare (born , died ) Bishop of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 313

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013