Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop JosÚ Alfonso MelÚndez, O.F.M. Disc. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1690³BornMadrid, Spain
20 Jun 170817.5ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Friars Minor
21 Sep 171524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Friars Minor
6 Sep 174049.7SelectedBishop of Potenza, Italy
30 Jan 174150.1ConfirmedBishop of Potenza, Italy
5 Feb 174150.2Ordained BishopBishop of Potenza, Italy
26 Dec 174757.0SelectedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
19 Feb 174857.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
31 Oct 175362.9DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for JosÚ Alfonso MelÚndez:
Archbishop JosÚ Alfonso MelÚndez O.F.M. Disc. (born , died ) Archbishop of Palermo

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 327, and Page 347
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1700, Page 60, Number 271
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1741, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015