Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Bravi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Colombo, Sri Lanka

Titular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1813Born
1831²17.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
19 Jun 183622.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
3 Aug 184935.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Colombo, Sri Lanka
3 Aug 184935.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
13 Jan 185036.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
25 Jan 185743.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Colombo, Sri Lanka
15 Aug 186046.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Colombo, Sri Lanka

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Bravi (VIAF: 7668398)
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Bravi O.S.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Colombo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontesanto, Diocese of Potenza, Italy
Ordained BishopSainte Lucie, Cathedral, Colombo, Diocese of Colombo

  • a priest for 24.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 555
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1850, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast