Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father John Angel Romaniello, M.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Guilin [Kweilin], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1900Born
1 Jul 191716.8ProfessedMember of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
17 Jun 192827.7Ordained PriestPriest of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
9 Oct 193030.0Final VowsPriest of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
10 Jun 193837.7AppointedPrefect of Guilin [Kweilin], China
1983²82.3ResignedPrefect of Guilin [Kweilin], China
22 Oct 198585.1DiedPrefect Emeritus of Guilin [Kweilin], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Angel Romaniello
Father John Angel Romaniello M.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Guilin [Kweilin]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvigliana, Diocese of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo, Italy
Death PlaceSt. Teresa’s Residence, Maryknoll

  • a priest for 57.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1981
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast