Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anne Carron de Murviel

Deceased

Bishop of Montauban, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1568²Born
15 Nov 160032.8AppointedBishop of Montauban, France
15 Aug 160133.6Ordained BishopBishop of Montauban, France
8 Sep 165284.6DiedBishop of Montauban, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anne Carron de Murviel
Bishop Anne Carron de Murviel (born 1568, died ) Bishop of Montauban

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMurviel

  • a bishop for 51.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 246
  • ob/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1601, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast