Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Joseph Germain Marie Ginoux

Bishop of Montauban, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1947 Born
29 Jun 198638.7Ordained PriestPriest of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France
11 May 200759.5AppointedBishop of Montauban, France
2 Sep 200759.8Ordained BishopBishop of Montauban, France

MicroData Summary for Bernard Joseph Germain Marie Ginoux
Bishop Bernard Joseph Germain Marie Ginoux (born ) Bishop of Montauban

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvignon

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Montauban.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 May 2007
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,498

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018