Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Georges Cardinal d’Amboise (I)

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1460²BornChaumont-sur-Loire
18 Jun 148222.5SelectedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
1484¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 148425.0AppointedBishop of Montauban, France
Feb 1489²29.1Ordained BishopBishop of Montauban, France
2 Dec 149131.9ResignedBishop of Montauban, France
2 Dec 149131.9SelectedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
14 Mar 149232.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
21 Aug 149333.6SelectedArchbishop of Rouen, France
21 Apr 149434.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Rouen, France
21 Sep 149434.7InstalledArchbishop of Rouen, France
17 Sep 149838.7Elevated to Cardinal
17 Sep 149838.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
25 May 151050.4DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Georges d’Amboise (I):
Cardinal Georges d’Amboise (I) (died ) Archbishop of Rouen

  • a priest for 26.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
  • a cardinal for 11.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Sep 1498

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013