Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edward Myers

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Titular Archbishop of Beroea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1875Born
7 Dec 190227.2Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
10 Jun 193256.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
10 Jun 193256.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamus
25 Jul 193256.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamus
20 Jan 195175.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
20 Jan 195175.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Beroea
13 Sep 195681.0DiedCoadjutor Archbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Edward Myers (VIAF: 89237552)
Archbishop Edward Myers (born , died ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWalmgate, City of York, Diocese of Beverley, England
Ordained PriestSt. Mary, Seminary, Oscott, Sutton Coldfield, Warwickshire, Diocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Death PlaceSt. Mary, Church, Chelsea, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Buried Place (Original)Galilee Chapel, St. Edmund, College, Old Hall Green, Ware, Hertfordshire, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 46
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 158
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 6 Nov 2018

Quantcast