Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Kevin O’Brien

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Árd Carna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1923Born
20 Jun 194825.3Ordained PriestPriest of Leeds, England, Great Britain
9 Nov 198158.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
9 Nov 198158.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Árd Carna
8 Dec 198158.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Árd Carna
25 Jun 199875.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
27 Dec 200481.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Kevin O’Brien
Bishop Thomas Kevin O’Brien (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Middlesbrough

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCork City, County Cork, Diocese of Cork, Ireland
Ordained PriestDublin City, County Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin, Ireland
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Perpetual Succour, Cathedral, Middlesbrough, North Yorkshire, Diocese of Middlesbrough, England
Death PlaceLittle Sisters of the Poor, Convent, Headingley, Leeds, West Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary, Cathedral, Coulby Newham, Middlesbrough, Cleveland, Diocese of Middlesbrough, England

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast