Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry John Poskitt

Deceased

Bishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1888Born
25 Sep 191527.0Converted
15 Jul 191728.8Ordained PriestPriest of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
19 Aug 193647.9AppointedBishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain
21 Sep 193648.0Ordained BishopBishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain
19 Feb 195061.4DiedBishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Henry John Poskitt
Bishop Henry John Poskitt (born , died ) Bishop of Leeds

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBirkin, near Selby, Yorkshire

  • a priest for 32.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 62
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 170

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018