Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Gordon Wheeler

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Leeds, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1910BornSaddleworth, Yorkshire
18 Sep 193626.4Converted
31 Mar 194029.9Ordained PriestPriest of Leeds, England, Great Britain
29 Jan 196453.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
29 Jan 196453.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Theudalis
19 Mar 196453.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theudalis
25 Apr 196656.0AppointedBishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain
27 Jun 196656.1InstalledBishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain
12 Jul 198575.2RetiredBishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain
20 Feb 199887.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Leeds, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Gordon Wheeler:
Bishop William Gordon Wheeler (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Leeds

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 213

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 13 Nov 2014