Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Joseph Hannon

Deceased

Bishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1884Born
22 Sep 190723.2Ordained PriestPriest of Newport, Wales, Great Britain
15 Mar 194156.7AppointedBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
1 May 194156.8Ordained BishopBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
26 Apr 194661.8DiedBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Daniel Joseph Hannon
Bishop Daniel Joseph Hannon (born , died ) Bishop of Menevia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRotherham, South Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England
Ordained PriestSt. Mary, Seminary, Oscott, Sutton Coldfield, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Sorrows, Cathedral, Wrexham, Wrexham, Diocese of Menevia, Wales
Death PlaceBishop's House, Sontley Road, Wrexham, Wrexham, Diocese of Menevia, Wales
Buried Place (Original)Wrexham, Cemetery, Ruabon Road, Wrexham, Wrexham, Diocese of Menevia, Wales

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 20
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 115
  • c4: CB, 9 Mar 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,347
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast