Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Francis Ryder Wood

Deceased

Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1904Born
25 May 193328.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 May 194035.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada
11 May 194035.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Livias
1943¹38.2ResignedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francis Ryder Wood
Father Francis Ryder Wood (born ) Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Winnipeg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSheffield, Great Britain

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast