Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Robert Cowgill

Deceased

Bishop of Leeds, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1860BornBroughton-in-Craven
19 May 188323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Leeds, England, Great Britain
26 Sep 190545.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain
26 Sep 190545.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Olena
30 Nov 190545.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olena
7 Jun 191151.2SucceededBishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain
12 May 193676.2DiedBishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Robert Cowgill:
Bishop Joseph Robert Cowgill (born , died ) Bishop of Leeds

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 50
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015