Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Lacy

Deceased

Bishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1841Born
21 Dec 186726.9Ordained PriestPriest of Beverley, England, Great Britain
2 Dec 187938.8AppointedBishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
18 Dec 187938.9Ordained BishopBishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
11 Apr 192988.2DiedBishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Lacy
Bishop Richard Lacy (born , died ) Bishop of Middlesbrough

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNavan, County Meath, Diocese of Meath, Ireland
Ordained PriestVenerable English, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Perpetual Succour, Cathedral, Middlesbrough, North Yorkshire, Diocese of Middlesbrough, England
Death PlaceBishop's House (Grove Lea), Middlesbrough, North Yorkshire, Diocese of Middlesbrough, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Joseph, Cemetery, North Ormesby, Middlesbrough, North Yorkshire, Diocese of Middlesbrough, England
Buried Place (Current)St. Mary, Cathedral, Coulby Newham, Middlesbrough, Cleveland, Diocese of Middlesbrough, England

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 49.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 376
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 137
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 66
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast