Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Shine

Deceased

Bishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1872Born
29 Jun 189422.3Ordained PriestPriest of Leeds, England, Great Britain
13 Jun 192149.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
13 Jun 192149.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamus
29 Jun 192149.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamus
11 Apr 192957.1SucceededBishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
1 May 192957.2InstalledBishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
19 Jan 195582.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
22 Nov 195583.7DiedBishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Shine
Archbishop Thomas Shine (born , died ) Bishop of Middlesbrough

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKnocknaveigh, County Tipperary, Archdiocese of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. Anne, Cathedral, Leeds, West Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Perpetual Succour, Cathedral, Middlesbrough, North Yorkshire, Diocese of Middlesbrough, England
Death PlaceBishop's House, Cambridge Road, Middlesbrough, North Yorkshire, Diocese of Middlesbrough, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Joseph, Cemetery, North Ormesby, Middlesbrough, North Yorkshire, Diocese of Middlesbrough, England
Buried Place (Current)St. Mary, Cathedral, Coulby Newham, Middlesbrough, Cleveland, Diocese of Middlesbrough, England

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 50
  • c4: CB, 12 Nov 2014
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 181
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,298
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 217, and Page 247
  • ab: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 13, Page 286
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast