Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Aloysius Ward, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1929Born
7 Jun 195324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
25 Jul 198051.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
1 Oct 198051.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
5 Feb 198152.0SucceededBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
25 Mar 198354.1AppointedArchbishop of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain
26 Oct 200172.7ResignedArchbishop of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain
27 Mar 200778.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Aloysius Ward (VIAF: 94867030)
Archbishop John Aloysius Ward O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cardiff

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeeds, West Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England
Ordained PriestOur Lady of Sorrows, Church, Peckham, London, Diocese of Southwark, England
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Sorrows, Cathedral, Wrexham, Wrexham, Diocese of Menevia, Wales
Death PlaceYstradowen, Cowbridge, Glamorgan, Archdiocese of Cardiff, Wales
Buried Place (Original)St. Joseph, Abbey, Llantarnam, Cwmbran, Torfaen, Archdiocese of Cardiff, Wales

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018
  • c1: CL, 30 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 May 2018

Quantcast