Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerald Moverley

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hallam, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1922Born
28 Apr 194624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Leeds, England, Great Britain
6 Dec 196745.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain
6 Dec 196745.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tinis in Proconsulari
25 Jan 196845.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tinis in Proconsulari
30 May 198058.1AppointedBishop of Hallam, England, Great Britain
3 Jul 198058.2InstalledBishop of Hallam, England, Great Britain
9 Jul 199674.2ResignedBishop of Hallam, England, Great Britain
14 Dec 199674.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Hallam, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Gerald Moverley
Bishop Gerald Moverley (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hallam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBradford, West Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England
Ordained PriestSt. Anne, Cathedral, Leeds, West Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England
Ordained BishopSt. Marie, Church, Sheffield, South Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England
Death PlaceQuarters, Carsick Hill Way, Sheffield, South Yorkshire, Diocese of Hallam, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Marie, Cathedral, Sheffield, South Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 156
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 27 Mar 2018