Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rex Andrew Clement Alarcon

Bishop of Daet, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1970 Born
11 Nov 199525.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Caceres (Nueva Caceres), Philippines
9 Nov 199626.2Ordained PriestPriest of Caceres (Nueva Caceres), Philippines
2 Jan 201948.4AppointedBishop of Daet, Philippines
19 Mar 201948.6Ordained BishopBishop of Daet, Philippines
20 Mar 201948.6InstalledBishop of Daet, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Rex Andrew Clement Alarcon
Bishop Rex Andrew Clement Alarcon (born ) Bishop of Daet

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDaet, Camarines Norte, Archdiocese of Caceres (Nueva Caceres)
Ordained BishopSt. John the Evangelist, Cathedral, Naga City, Archdiocese of Caceres (Nueva Caceres)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Daet.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Jan 2019
  • od: CB, 4 Jan 2019
  • ob: CB, 8 Jan 2019
  • 12.loc: CB, 10 Jan 2019
  • c2+: CB, 4 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Mar 2019

Quantcast