Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Rojas Rojas, Jr.

Bishop of Libmanan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1956 BornCebu City
29 Mar 198124.6Ordained PriestPriest of Caceres (Nueva Caceres), Philippines
25 Jul 200548.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caceres (Nueva Caceres), Philippines
25 Jul 200548.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Idassa
15 Sep 200549.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Idassa
19 May 200851.8AppointedPrelate of Libmanan, Philippines
2 Jul 200851.9InstalledPrelate of Libmanan, Philippines
25 Mar 200952.6AppointedBishop of Libmanan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for José Rojas Rojas, Jr.:
Bishop José Rojas Rojas, Jr. (born ) Bishop of Libmanan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Libmanan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2005
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 May 2008
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,974

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013