Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Concordio Maria Sarte

Deceased

Bishop of Legazpi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1931BornPili
17 Mar 195625.2Ordained PriestPriest of Caceres (Nueva Caceres), Philippines
25 Apr 197342.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caceres (Nueva Caceres), Philippines
25 Apr 197342.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thunusuda
22 Jul 197342.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thunusuda
30 Aug 197746.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sorsogon, Philippines
12 Aug 198049.6AppointedBishop of Legazpi, Philippines
22 Nov 199160.9DiedBishop of Legazpi, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Concordio Maria Sarte:
Bishop Concordio Maria Sarte (born , died ) Bishop of Legazpi

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/ab: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 3 Feb 2014