Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Prospero Nale Arellano

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Libmanan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1937BornBombon
30 Mar 196326.2Ordained PriestPriest
9 Dec 198952.9AppointedPrelate of Libmanan, Philippines
19 Mar 199053.2Ordained BishopPrelate of Libmanan, Philippines
19 May 200871.3ResignedPrelate of Libmanan, Philippines
1 Feb 201477.0DiedPrelate Emeritus of Libmanan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Prospero Nale Arellano:
Bishop Prospero Nale Arellano (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Libmanan

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,062
  • d: CB, 2 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 3 Feb 2014