Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Antonio Lillo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Caceres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1764BornLillo, Spain
15 Dec 182864.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
15 Dec 182864.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
13 Dec 182965.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
17 Oct 183066.0SelectedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
28 Feb 183166.4ConfirmedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
3 Dec 1840³76.2DiedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio Lillo:
Bishop Juan Antonio Lillo O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Nueva Caceres

  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 70, and Page 123
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 146, Number 795

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 21 Oct 2014