Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Precioso Dacalos Cantillas, S.D.B.

Bishop of Maasin, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1953 Born
7 Dec 197926.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
31 May 199541.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cebu, Philippines
31 May 199541.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Vicus Caesaris
12 Jul 199542.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vicus Caesaris
20 Jan 199844.5AppointedBishop of Maasin, Philippines
11 Mar 199844.6InstalledBishop of Maasin, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Precioso Dacalos Cantillas
Bishop Precioso Dacalos Cantillas S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Maasin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLangtad
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cebu City, Archdiocese of Cebu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Maasin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,573
  • mn: CB, 21 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 8 Apr 2018