Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Baptiste Adhémar de Monteil de Grignan

Deceased

Archbishop of Arles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1638¹Born
166729.0SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Arles, France
3 Aug 166729.5ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Arles, France
3 Aug 166729.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Claudiopolis in Honoriade
11 Dec 166729.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Claudiopolis in Honoriade
9 Mar 168951.1SucceededArchbishop of Arles, France
11 Nov 169759.8DiedArchbishop of Arles, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Adhémar de Monteil de Grignan:
Archbishop Jean-Baptiste Adhémar de Monteil de Grignan (died ) Archbishop of Arles

  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 153, and Page 92
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1667, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015