Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal Flandrin

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Auch

Note/Previous Titular See: (Pseudocardinal)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1301BornVivier, France
20 May 137978.4AppointedArchbishop of Auch, France
18 Dec 137979.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Auch, France
17 Oct 139089.8Elevated to Cardinal
17 Oct 139089.8ResignedArchbishop of Auch, France
8 Jul 1415114.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Auch, France

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Jean Flandrin:
Jean Cardinal Flandrin (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Auch

  • a bishop for 35.6 years
  • a cardinal for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Oct 1390
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,981

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 24 Jan 2014