Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Joseph Chapelle de Saint-Jean de Jumilhac

Deceased

Archbishop of Arles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1706BornBrive
2 Apr 174235.5SelectedBishop of Vannes, France
9 Jul 174235.8ConfirmedBishop of Vannes, France
12 Aug 174235.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vannes, France
17 Apr 174639.5SelectedArchbishop of Arles, France
10 Jun 174639.7ResignedBishop of Vannes, France
19 Sep 174640.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Arles, France
20 Feb 177568.4DiedArchbishop of Arles, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Joseph Chapelle de Saint-Jean de Jumilhac:
Archbishop Jean-Joseph Chapelle de Saint-Jean de Jumilhac (born , died ) Archbishop of Arles

  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 97, and Page 436

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 15 Oct 2013