Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Philippe Cardinal de Lévis

Deceased

Archbishop of Arles, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1435Born
29 Mar 145418.4AppointedArchbishop of Auch, France
24 Mar 146327.3AppointedArchbishop of Arles, France
7 May 147337.5Elevated to Cardinal
17 May 147337.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
4 Nov 147540.0DiedArchbishop of Arles, France

MicroData Summary for Philippe de Lévis (VIAF: 251638659)
Philippe Cardinal de Lévis (born , died ) Archbishop of Arles

EventPlace
Birth Place
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 2.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 93, and Page 100
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 May 1473
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1454, Number 6*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Aug 2018

Quantcast