Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Adhémar de Monteil de Grignan

Deceased

Archbishop of Arles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1603BornGrignan
12 May 163026.7SelectedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
16 Dec 163027.3ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
14 Sep 163128.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
31 Mar 164440.6SelectedArchbishop of Arles, France
16 Jan 164541.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Arles, France
9 Mar 168985.5DiedArchbishop of Arles, France

MicroData Summary for François Adhémar de Monteil de Grignan:
Archbishop François Adhémar de Monteil de Grignan (born , died ) Archbishop of Arles

  • a bishop for 57.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013