Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bertrand Cardinal de Saint Martin, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateEventTitle
1248²AppointedBishop of Fréjus, France
5 Mar 1264AppointedBishop of Avignon, France
11 Oct 1266AppointedArchbishop of Arles, France
3 Jun 1273AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
3 Jun 1273Elevated to Cardinal
28 Mar 1275DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bertrand de Saint Martin:
Cardinal Bertrand de Saint Martin O.S.B. (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a cardinal for 1.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 Jun 1273

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 5 Jan 2014