Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Ferrer

Deceased

Archbishop of Arles, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1463Born
3 Dec 149835.4AppointedBishop of Melfi, Italy
26 Jul 149936.0AppointedArchbishop of Arles, France
17 Jan 152157.5DiedArchbishop of Arles, France

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Ferrer
Archbishop Giovanni Ferrer (born , died ) Archbishop of Arles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTarregor
Death PlaceMarseille

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 189, and Page 93
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 116
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1498, Number 58*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast