Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Santa Fe de la Vera Cruz

Archidioecesis Sanctae Fidei Verae Crucis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • José María Arancedo, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 19 September 1992
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Argentina
  • Square Kilometers: 30,701 (11,858 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquisantafe.org.ar/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Avenida General Lopez 2720, S3000DCJ Santa Fe, Argentina
  • Telephone: (0342)459-5791
  • Fax: 459-4491

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Santa Fe
15 February 1897ErectedDiocese of Paraná Diocese of Santa Fe (erected)
20 April 1934Territory LostDiocese of Santa Fe Diocese of Rosario (erected)
Archdiocese of Santa Fe
20 April 1934ElevatedDiocese of Santa Fe Archdiocese of Santa Fe
3 June 1939Territory LostArchdiocese of Santa Fe Diocese of Resistencia (erected)
11 February 1957Territory LostArchdiocese of Santa Fe Diocese of Reconquista (erected)
10 April 1961Territory LostDiocese of Reconquista
Archdiocese of Santa Fe
Diocese of Rafaela (erected)
Archdiocese of Santa Fe de la Vera Cruz
19 September 1992Name ChangedArchdiocese of Santa Fe Archdiocese of Santa Fe de la Vera Cruz

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Santa Fe
1950700,000736,60095.0%134772113,317141523107ap1951
1966615,000665,00092.5%105731783,4557348075ap1967
1970497,431.0%805813808240979ap1971
1976643,000693,40092.7%75551304,9467530070ap1977
1980506,000560,00090.4%68651333,80467217581ap1981
1990670,000720,00093.1%81471285,23496720098ap1991
Archdiocese of Santa Fe de la Vera Cruz
1999770,000850,00090.6%92461385,579165523690ap2000
2000790,000875,00090.3%96431395,683185224188ap2001
2001795,000880,00090.3%94451395,719184820388ap2002
2002790,000890,00088.8%96331296,124184321989ap2003
2003800,000890,00089.9%102321345,970184024389ap2004
2004810,000895,00090.5%98401385,869165121489ap2005
2010840,000960,00087.5%101301316,412183112391ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 14 Apr 2013