Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Lahore

Archidioecesis Lahorensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Sebastian Francis Shaw, O.F.M., Archbishop
  • Lawrence John Saldanha, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 23 April 1994
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Pakistan
  • Square Kilometers: 23,069 (8,910 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archdioceselahore.org/
  • Mailing Address: G.P.O. Box 909, Main Mohammad Shafi Rd., Lahore 54000, Pakistan
  • Telephone: (042)6366.137
  • Fax: 6368.336

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Lahore
1 September 1886ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Punjab Diocese of Lahore (erected)
6 July 1887Territory LostDiocese of Lahore Prefecture Apostolic of Kafiristan e Kashmir (erected)
13 September 1910Territory LostArchdiocese of Agra
Diocese of Lahore
Archdiocese of Simla (erected)
17 December 1936Territory LostDiocese of Lahore Prefecture Apostolic of Multan (erected)
17 January 1952Territory LostDiocese of Lahore Prefecture Apostolic of Jullundur (erected)
17 January 1952Territory LostDiocese of Lahore
Diocese of Rawalpindi
Prefecture Apostolic of Kashmir and Jammu (erected)
Archdiocese of Lahore
23 April 1994ElevatedDiocese of Lahore Archdiocese of Lahore

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Lahore
195078,42915,000,000.5%240421,8675102ap1951
1970156,2406,448,5752.4%842503,12458168ap1971
1980166,00010,371,0001.6%1344572,9125916821ap1981
1990425,6032,025,00021.0%2033538,0307620225ap1991
Archdiocese of Lahore
1999505,88322,000,0002.3%3031618,2939021425ap2000
2000511,22623,000,0002.2%3031618,3809021425ap2001
2001514,22623,500,0002.2%2943727,14210222325ap2002
2002550,00023,030,0002.4%3237697,97115220326ap2003
2003560,46324,000,0002.3%32154711,92412919725ap2004
2004570,00025,000,0002.3%3042727,9165821524ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 14 Nov 2013