Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Dar-es-Salaam

Archidioecesis Daressalaamensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jude Thaddaeus Ruwa’ichi, O.F.M. Cap., Archbishop
  • Henry Mchamungu, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Stephano Lameck Musomba, O.S.A., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Polycarp Pengo, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Southern Zanguebar {Zanguebar Meridionale}
16 November 1887SplitVicariate Apostolic of Zanguebar Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Zanguebar
Prefecture Apostolic of Southern Zanguebar {Zanguebar Meridionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Zanguebar {Zanguebar Meridionale}
15 September 1902ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Southern Zanguebar {Zanguebar Meridionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Zanguebar {Zanguebar Meridionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Dar-es-Salaam
10 August 1906Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Southern Zanguebar {Zanguebar Meridionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Dar-es-Salaam
12 November 1913Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Dar-es-Salaam Prefecture Apostolic of Lindi (erected)
3 March 1922Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Dar-es-Salaam Prefecture Apostolic of Iringa (erected)
22 December 1931Territory AddedPrefecture Apostolic of Iringa (Lulanga and Masagati) Vicariate Apostolic of Dar-es-Salaam
Archdiocese of Dar-es-Salaam
25 March 1953ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Dar-es-Salaam Archdiocese of Dar-es-Salaam
21 April 1964Territory LostArchdiocese of Dar-es-Salaam (Mahenge, the Game Reserve, and parts of Nachingwea) Diocese of Mahenge (erected)
9 July 1964Territory LostArchdiocese of Dar-es-Salaam (Liwale) Diocese of Nachingwea

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Dar-es-Salaam
195046,850500,0009.4%44751918855119ap1951
Archdiocese of Dar-es-Salaam
196948,000764,8616.3%539441,090508113ap1971
1980200,0001,385,00014.4%635414,878459029ap1981
1990439,9001,432,00030.7%1335489,1644512920ap1991
1999554,5783,217,06717.2%2772995,6019922933ap2000
2000869,3404,187,56420.8%31811127,76111524236ap2001
2001900,5004,500,00020.0%30951257,20412929238ap2002
20021,300,5004,500,00028.9%36951319,92713030341ap2003
20031,000,5004,600,00021.8%32971297,75513432241ap2004
20041,416,4004,720,60030.0%329712910,97913532144ap2005
20061,430,0004,800,00029.8%471401877,64726145850ap2007
20131,718,0005,661,00030.3%912573484,93636855075ap2014
20161,720,1085,782,47229.7%912113025,69526464589ap2017
20191,788,5426,200,00028.8%992033025,922267690114ap2020
20211,801,5006,350,00028.4%1132133265,526287683124ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Vicariate Apostolic of Dar-es-Salaam
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 24, Page 261
  • Archdiocese of Dar-es-Salaam
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 45, Page 705, to Page 710
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 79, Page 1,436, and Page 1,437

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 10 Nov 2023