Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Elia Eskandr Abd Elmalak, O.F.M.

Apostolic Administrator of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto} (-Eliopoli di Egitto-Port-Said)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1975 Born
4 Sep 200833.6Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
22 Aug 200934.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
29 Jul 201944.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto} (-Eliopoli di Egitto-Port-Said)

MicroData Summary for Elia Eskandr Abd Elmalak
Father Elia Eskandr Abd Elmalak O.F.M. (born ) Apostolic Administrator of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto} (-Eliopoli di Egitto-Port-Said)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAssiut

Please contact the Father through the Vicariate Apostolic of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto} (-Eliopoli di Egitto-Port-Said).

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast