Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Mzuzu

Dioecesis Mzuzuensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Mukasa Zuza, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 17 January 1961
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lilongwe
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Malawi
  • Square Kilometers: 21,500 (8,304 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Katoto, P.O. Box 2, Mzuzu, Malawi
  • Telephone: 332.222
  • Fax: 333.342

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Northern Nyassa
8 May 1947ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Nyassa Prefecture Apostolic of Northern Nyassa (erected)
Diocese of Mzuzu
17 January 1961ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Northern Nyassa Diocese of Mzuzu
21 July 2010Territory LostDiocese of Mzuzu Diocese of Karonga (erected)
9 February 2011Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Mzuzu (from Blantyre)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Mzuzu
197043,200635,0006.8%253557857714611ap1971
198061,500700,0008.8%940491,2555010811ap1981
199085,050747,00011.4%2626521,635369313ap1991
1999350,0001,900,00018.4%2719467,6082412514ap2000
2000360,0002,000,00018.0%2620467,8262712014ap2001
2001400,0002,200,00018.2%2915449,0902213014ap2002
2002450,0002,400,00018.8%3713509,0002213014ap2003
2003460,0002,600,00017.7%3215479,7872413014ap2004
2004480,0002,700,00017.8%29184710,2122713115ap2005
2010340,0001,520,00022.4%348428,09544510bul21Jul2010

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011