Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Territorial Prelature of Trondheim

Territorialis Praelatura Trudensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vacant
  • Bernt Ivar (Markus) Eidsvig, C.R.S.A., Apostolic Administrator
  • Georg Müller, SS.CC., Prelate Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Territorial Prelature
  • Elevated: 28 March 1979
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Norway
  • Square Kilometers: 56,458 (21,806 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Sverres gate 1, N-7012 Trondheim, Norge
  • Telephone: 73.52.77.05
  • Fax: 73.52.87.90

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Central Norway {Norvegia Centrale}
7 April 1931ErectedMission "Sui Iuris" of Central Norway {Norvegia Centrale} (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Central Norway {Norvegia Centrale} [Mellom-Norge]
10 March 1944ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Central Norway {Norvegia Centrale} Prefecture Apostolic of Central Norway {Norvegia Centrale} [Mellom-Norge]
Vicariate Apostolic of Central Norway {Norvegia Centrale}
4 February 1953ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Central Norway {Norvegia Centrale} [Mellom-Norge] Vicariate Apostolic of Central Norway {Norvegia Centrale}
Territorial Prelature of Trondheim
28 March 1979ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Central Norway {Norvegia Centrale} Territorial Prelature of Trondheim

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Central Norway {Norvegia Centrale} [Mellom-Norge]
1949230480,000.0%5485343ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Central Norway {Norvegia Centrale}
1970553571,553.1%881634838ap1971
Territorial Prelature of Trondheim
1980779601,500.1%1561296365ap1981
19901,644600,000.3%55328585ap1991
19992,576627,934.4%336429365ap2000
20002,803630,000.4%3364673165ap2001
20012,902630,000.5%4264832155ap2002
20023,080635,936.5%5274402145ap2003
20033,228637,400.5%6284032155ap2004
20043,228640,105.5%4156451165ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011