Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Morondava

Dioecesis Morondavensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 14 September 1955
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Toliara
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Madagascar
  • Square Kilometers: 46,620 (18,006 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: B.P. 132, Morondava 619, Madagascar
  • Telephone: (020)95.523.45
  • Fax: 95.524.05

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Morondava
8 January 1938ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Fianarantsoa
Vicariate Apostolic of Majunga
Vicariate Apostolic of Tananarive
Vicariate Apostolic of Antsirabé (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Morondava (erected)
Diocese of Morondava
14 September 1955ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Morondava Diocese of Morondava
25 April 1960Territory LostDiocese of Morondava Diocese of Morombe (erected)
3 December 2003Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Morondava (from Fianarantsoa)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Morondava
195020,553212,0009.7%10102,0558ap1951
Diocese of Morondava
197022,080226,2259.8%219211,05126193ap1971
198024,800234,00010.6%15151,65321354ap1981
199032,150262,00012.3%120211,53027364ap1991
199934,500421,9408.2%219211,64226515ap2000
200037,100435,8708.5%220221,68627515ap2001
200138,600437,3708.8%322251,54429555ap2002
200238,200448,2808.5%227291,31735515ap2003
200339,600456,3208.7%228301,32035566ap2004
200441,620460,2009.0%230321,30037646ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.7, 29 Jan 2012; data: 28 Jan 2012