Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Zoa

Deceased

Archbishop of Yaoundé, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1924Born
3 Oct 195026.7Ordained PriestPriest of Yaoundé, Cameroon
11 Sep 196137.6AppointedArchbishop of Yaoundé, Cameroon
21 Dec 196137.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Yaoundé, Cameroon
20 Mar 199874.2DiedArchbishop of Yaoundé, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Jean Zoa
Archbishop Jean Zoa (born 1924, died ) Archbishop of Yaoundé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaa

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jun 2017