Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christophe Zoa

Bishop of Sangmélima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1961 BornYaoundé
15 Jun 199130.0Ordained PriestPriest of Yaoundé, Cameroon
30 Nov 200645.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Yaoundé, Cameroon
30 Nov 200645.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hilta
3 Feb 200745.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hilta
4 Dec 200847.5AppointedBishop of Sangmélima, Cameroon
30 Jan 200947.6InstalledBishop of Sangmélima, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Christophe Zoa:
Bishop Christophe Zoa (born ) Bishop of Sangmélima

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sangmélima.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2006
  • c34: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,331
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Dec 2008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013